This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 05/03/2021 at 15:33:08 (UTC).

BARBER, JEFFERY JEROME, JR vs. BELL, SHARON LANETTet al.

Case Summary

On 03/04/2021 BARBER, JEFFERY JEROME, JR filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BELL, SHARON LANETT. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Paetra Brownlee. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************35-O

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Paetra Brownlee

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JEFFERY JEROME BARBER JR

Defendants

SHARON LANETT BELL

KIM KEN DEVELOPMENTS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEGAN SHAW

Defendant Attorney

RYAN HAYES

 

Court Documents

Answer

Answer; Comments: TO COMPLAINT

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND DISCLOSURE DESIGNATION OF PRINCIPAL E-MAIL ADDRESS

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: SHARON LANETT BELL

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND DISCLOSURE DESIGNATION OF PRINCIPAL E-MAIL ADDRESS

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served; Comments: SERVED AS TO KIM KEN DEVELOPMENTS INC

Complaint

Complaint; Comments: Count I, Count II

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Email sent to attorney

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Email sent to attorney

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer; Comments: TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND DISCLOSURE DESIGNATION OF PRINCIPAL E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service; Comments: SHARON LANETT BELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer; Comments: TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND DISCLOSURE DESIGNATION OF PRINCIPAL E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; Comments: SERVED AS TO KIM KEN DEVELOPMENTS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Email sent to attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/04/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint; Comments: Count I, Count II

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RYAN HAYES