This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 06/02/2022 at 16:58:47 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.vs.RICO JUSTIN AZAHAREZ JIMENEZ

Case Summary

On 05/09/2022 BANK OF AMERICA, N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RICO JUSTIN AZAHAREZ JIMENEZ. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrew Bain. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************56-O

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Andrew Bain

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

Defendant

RICO JUSTIN AZAHAREZ JIMENEZ

Orlando, FL 32807-4846

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KRISTINA MOEHLE

Defendant Attorney

WALTER BENENATI

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Affidavit of Non Military Service

Affidavit of Non Military Service

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: emailed to attorney

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served; Comments: RICO JUSTIN AZAHAREZ JIMENEZ SUBSTITUTE SERVED

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2022
  • HearingHearing: Pre-Trial Civil - Civil, Pretrial; Location: Video/Audio/Tele Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketHEARING - Pre-Trial Civil - Civil, Pretrial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; Comments: RICO JUSTIN AZAHAREZ JIMENEZ SUBSTITUTE SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: emailed to attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Kristina B Moehle; Amount: -310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Non Military Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BENENATI, WALTER F ESQ