This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 08/20/2022 at 16:07:35 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.vs.DAVID E CASEY

Case Summary

On 06/21/2022 BANK OF AMERICA, N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DAVID E CASEY. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Amy J Carter. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************72-O

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Amy J Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

Defendant

DAVID E CASEY

Windermere, FL 34786-8821

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JASON DRAGUTSKY

Defendant Attorney

WALTER BENENATI

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: em atty

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Stipulation

Stipulation; Comments: settlement

Summons Returned Unserved

Summons Returned Unserved

Order Approving Settlement

Order Approving Settlement; Comments: & Order Dismissing Case

Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • HearingHearing: CANCELED-Cancelled Pre-Trial Civil - Pulayya, Juna; Location: Video/Audio/Tele Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketHEARING - CANCELED-Cancelled Pre-Trial Civil - Pulayya, Juna

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Approving Settlement and/or Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Approving Settlement; Comments: & Order Dismissing Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation; Comments: settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Jason Scott Dragutsky; Amount: -310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: em atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BENENATI, WALTER F ESQ