This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 06/02/2022 at 16:31:10 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. vs. SMETANA, CRAIG S

Case Summary

On 05/09/2022 BANK OF AMERICA, N A filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SMETANA, CRAIG S. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Vincent S. Chiu. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************35-O

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Vincent S. Chiu

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

Defendant

CRAIG S SMETANA

Orlando, FL 32822-8312

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KRISTINA MOEHLE

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served; Comments: 5/10/2022 CRAIG S SMETANA

Answer

Answer; Comments: CC JUDGE 05.26.22

Letter

Letter

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer; Comments: CC JUDGE 05.26.22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; Comments: 5/10/2022 CRAIG S SMETANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Kristina B Moehle; Amount: -410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Moehle, Kristina B