This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 03/16/2023 at 16:46:27 (UTC).

BANG AUTOGLASS LLCvs.PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/20/2023 BANG AUTOGLASS LLCvs PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Elizabeth Gibson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************85-O

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Elizabeth Gibson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BANG AUTOGLASS LLC

WAYNE GADSON AAO

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAM ENGLAND

Defendant Attorney

VALERIA ZERBO

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Correspondence

Correspondence

Addendum to

Addendum to

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Interrogatories

Interrogatories

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed to attorney

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: service of process and original summons

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Comments: service of process and original summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed to attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: ENGLAND, WILLIAM SCOTT; Amount: -185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInterrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrespondence

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less