This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 09/17/2022 at 16:20:32 (UTC).

BANG AUTOGLASS LLCvs.PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE BAYSIDE INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INSURANCE CO

Case Summary

On 07/19/2022 BANG AUTOGLASS LLCvs PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE BAYSIDE INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INSURANCE CO was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian Sandor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************13-O

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Brian Sandor

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BANG AUTOGLASS LLC

PINNACLE OF FAITH MINISTRIES AAO

Defendants

PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE BAYSIDE INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE SOUTHEASTERN INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CHAD BARR

WILLIAM ENGLAND

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Correspondence

Correspondence

Addendum to

Addendum to; Comments: Administrative Order 2009-12-02

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed Issued Summon to the Attorney

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: SERVICE OF PROCESS AND ORIGINAL SUMMONS (NO ATTACHMENT)

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Comments: SERVICE OF PROCESS AND ORIGINAL SUMMONS (NO ATTACHMENT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed Issued Summon to the Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Chad A. Barr; Amount: -320.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 320.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to; Comments: Administrative Order 2009-12-02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrespondence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE BAYSIDE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE SOUTHEASTERN INSURANCE COMAPNY is a litigant

Latest cases where Bang Autoglass Llc is a litigant