This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 08/03/2021 at 15:42:39 (UTC).

BABUS PATEL, NISHIDH MANHARBHAIet al. vs. TEETER, BLAIR Aet al.

Case Summary

On 06/04/2021 BABUS PATEL, NISHIDH MANHARBHAI filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against TEETER, BLAIR A. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Denise Kim Beamer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************55-O

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Denise Kim Beamer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NISHIDH MANHARBHAI BABUS PATEL

SONALBEN NISHIDH PATEL

Defendants

BLAIR A TEETER

INFINITY OF ORLANDO LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DARYLAINE HERNANDEZ

Defendant Attorneys

RAYMOND HAAS

VANESSA MERASSAINT

 

Court Documents

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Complaint

Complaint

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Copies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service; Comments: RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Taking Deposition(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Copies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Taking Deposition(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Taking Deposition(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 06/04/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer VANESSA MERASSAINT

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAAS, RAYMOND A