This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 09/17/2022 at 15:57:33 (UTC).

AUTOVEST FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLCvs.JARIYA EDWARDS

Case Summary

On 07/19/2022 AUTOVEST FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLCvs JARIYA EDWARDS was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrew L Cameron. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************80-O

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Andrew L Cameron

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AUTOVEST FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC

Defendant

JARIYA EDWARDS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JEFFREY BLACHER

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EM ATTY

Summons Returned Unserved

Summons Returned Unserved; Comments: unserved jariya edwards

Alias Summons Issued

Alias Summons Issued; Comments: em atty

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAlias Summons Issued; Comments: em atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: SPINOZZA, KEVIN JOHN; Amount: -10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Unserved; Comments: unserved jariya edwards

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EM ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: KEVIN SPINOZZA; Amount: -310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Autovest Financial Services LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BLACHER , JEFFREY W