This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 11/19/2022 at 16:26:15 (UTC).

AT HOME AUTO GLASS LLCvs.SAFECO NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY, SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS, SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA

Case Summary

On 09/20/2022 AT HOME AUTO GLASS LLCvs SAFECO NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY, SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS, SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Carly S Wish. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************70-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Carly S Wish

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AT HOME AUTO GLASS LLC

ASHLEY MARSHALL AAO

Defendants

SAFECO NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS

SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

IMRAN MALIK

Defendant Attorney

JORDAN BROUGHER

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Addendum to

Addendum to

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Interrogatories

Interrogatories

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EM ATTY

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Answer

Answer; Comments: TO COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer; Comments: TO COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EM ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Imran Malik; Amount: -185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInterrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SAFECO NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where AT HOME AUTO GLASS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois is a litigant

Latest cases where Safeco Insurance Company of America is a litigant