This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 08/14/2022 at 16:14:49 (UTC).

AT HOME AUTO GLASS LLCvs.PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/14/2022 AT HOME AUTO GLASS LLCvs PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian Sandor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************50-O

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Brian Sandor

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AT HOME AUTO GLASS LLC

JOSELYN MENDOZA AAO

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

IMRAN MALIK

Defendant Attorney

GENEVA FOUNTAIN

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet; Comments: ADDENDUM

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Complaint

Complaint

Interrogatories

Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFT

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions; Comments: TO DEFT

Request to Produce

Request to Produce; Comments: TO DEFT

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: To Respond to Complaint

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS DISCOVERY REQUESTS

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS DISCOVERY REQUESTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: To Respond to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Imran Malik; Amount: -185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce; Comments: TO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions; Comments: TO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInterrogatories; Comments: TO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Comments: ADDENDUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AT HOME AUTO GLASS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Progressive American Insurance Company is a litigant