This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 07/23/2022 at 16:18:03 (UTC).

AT HOME AUTO GLASS LLCvs.GREAT WEST CASUALTY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/24/2022 AT HOME AUTO GLASS LLCvs GREAT WEST CASUALTY COMPANY was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Eric H DuBois. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************17-O

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Eric H DuBois

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AT HOME AUTO GLASS LLC

LOUIS CARLSON AAO

Defendant

GREAT WEST CASUALTY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHN LAGROW

Defendant Attorney

EDWIN VALEN

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Addendum to

Addendum to; Comments: Administrative Order 2009-12-02

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Interrogatories

Interrogatories

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed Attorney Issued Summon

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply to Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed Attorney Issued Summon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Imran Malik; Amount: -185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInterrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to; Comments: Administrative Order 2009-12-02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AT HOME AUTO GLASS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where GREAT WEST CASUALTY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EDWIN V VALEN