Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 02/04/2019 at 15:45:09 (UTC).

AT HOME AUTO GLASS LLC vs. WINDHAVEN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/06/2018 AT HOME AUTO GLASS LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WINDHAVEN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Faye L Allen. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************16-O

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Faye L Allen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KIMBER CLARK AKA

AT HOME AUTO GLASS LLC

Defendant

WINDHAVEN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

IMRAN MALIK

Defendant Attorney

STEVE SIMEONIDIS

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal; Comments: sent to rec

Notice of Settlement

Notice of Settlement; Comments: AT HOME AUTO GLASS LLC

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: WINDHAVEN INSURANCE COMPANY

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND NOTICE OF FILING DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY ELECTRONIC SERVICE EMAIL ADDRESS

Not of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med

Not of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med; Comments: and notice of designation of email

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Interrogatories

Interrogatories

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Voluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Voluntary Dismissal; Comments: sent to rec

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • HEARING - CANCELED-Cancelled Pre-Trial Civil - Civil, Pretrial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Settlement; Comments: AT HOME AUTO GLASS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: WINDHAVEN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND NOTICE OF FILING DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY ELECTRONIC SERVICE EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Not of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med; Comments: and notice of designation of email

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice to Appear Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Description: Payment; Payer: Imran Ebrahim Malik; Amount: -90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AT HOME AUTO GLASS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Windhaven Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Simeonidis Steve, Esq