This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 02/04/2019 at 15:41:43 (UTC).

AT HOME AUTO GLASS LLC vs. HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, HARTFORD ACCIDENT AND INDEMNITY COMPANY, HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST, HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE SOUTHEAST, PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY OF HARTFOR

Case Summary

On 12/06/2018 AT HOME AUTO GLASS LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, HARTFORD ACCIDENT AND INDEMNITY COMPANY, HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST, HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE SOUTHEAST, PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY OF HARTFOR. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are David P Johnson and Evellen H Jewett. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************98-O

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

David P Johnson

Evellen H Jewett

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AT HOME AUTO GLASS LLC

SHIRLEY DAVIS AKA

SHIRLEY DAVIS AAO

Defendants

PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY OF HARTFOR

HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE SOUTHEAST

HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST

HARTFORD ACCIDENT AND INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

IMRAN MALIK

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

Stipulation

Stipulation; Comments: defendant to appear

Notice of Settlement

Notice of Settlement

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY DONNA MOCH

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Interrogatories

Interrogatories

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Voluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Voluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation; Comments: defendant to appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • HEARING - CANCELED-Cancelled Pre-Trial Civil - Civil, Pretrial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY DONNA MOCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice to Appear Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Description: Payment; Payer: Imran Ebrahim Malik; Amount: -90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 90.00

    Read MoreRead Less