This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 11/20/2022 at 15:59:09 (UTC).

AT HOME AUTO GLASS LLCvs.ASSURANCEAMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/21/2022 AT HOME AUTO GLASS LLCvs ASSURANCEAMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrew L Cameron. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************75-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Andrew L Cameron

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AT HOME AUTO GLASS LLC

ROBIN MCARTHUR AAO

Defendant

ASSURANCEAMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHN LAGROW

Defendant Attorney

TERA RADIGAN

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Addendum to

Addendum to; Comments: Administrative Order NO. 2009-12-02

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Interrogatories

Interrogatories

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed Issued Summon to the Attorney

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed Issued Summon to the Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Imran Malik; Amount: -185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInterrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to; Comments: Administrative Order NO. 2009-12-02

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ASSURANCEAMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where AT HOME AUTO GLASS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JOHN LAGROW