This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 11/22/2020 at 16:03:34 (UTC).

AT HOME AUTO GLASS LLCvs.USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 AT HOME AUTO GLASS LLCvs USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Gisela T Laurent. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************39-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Gisela T Laurent

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AT HOME AUTO GLASS LLC AAO MARGARET BOYD

MARGARET BOYD AAO

AT HOME AUTO GLASS LLC

Defendant

USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

IMRAN MALIK

Defendant Attorney

WILLIAM KEBLER

 

Court Documents

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY

Motion to Stay

Motion to Stay; Comments: PENDING RULING ON DEFENDANT S MOTION TO DISMISS, STRIKE AND FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT AND MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

Motion to Dismiss

Motion to Dismiss; Comments: COMPLAINT/STATEMENT OF CLAIM, MOTION TO STRIKE ALLEGATIONS OF COMPLAINT/STATEMENT OF CLAIM, AND MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EM ATTY

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim; Comments: USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Interrogatories

Interrogatories

Addendum to

Addendum to

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Stay; Comments: PENDING RULING ON DEFENDANT S MOTION TO DISMISS, STRIKE AND FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT AND MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss; Comments: COMPLAINT/STATEMENT OF CLAIM, MOTION TO STRIKE ALLEGATIONS OF COMPLAINT/STATEMENT OF CLAIM, AND MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EM ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Imran Malik; Amount: -185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim; Comments: USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInterrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less