This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 11/22/2020 at 16:02:16 (UTC).

AT HOME AUTO GLASS LLCvs.PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 AT HOME AUTO GLASS LLCvs PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Elizabeth J Starr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************32-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Elizabeth J Starr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AT HOME AUTO GLASS LLC AAO LATIFFANY ROBINSON

AT HOME AUTO GLASS LLC

LATIFFANY ROBINSON AAO

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

IMRAN MALIK

Defendant Attorney

LISA LEWIS

 

Court Documents

Objection

Objection; Comments: FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE

Objection

Objection; Comments: FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

Objection

Objection; Comments: TO PLAINTIFF S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL APPRAISAL

Notice of Intent

Notice of Intent; Comments: TO RELY ON CERTIFICATION OF BUSINESS RECORD

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: CASE LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS, OR ALTERNATIVELY, MOTION TO STAY AND COMPEL APPRAISAL

Motion to Dismiss

Motion to Dismiss; Comments: OR ALTERNATIVELY MOTION TO STAY AND COMPEL APPRAISAL

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EM ATTY

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim; Comments: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Interrogatories

Interrogatories

Addendum to

Addendum to

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketObjection; Comments: FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketObjection; Comments: FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketObjection; Comments: TO PLAINTIFF S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Comments: SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL APPRAISAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Intent; Comments: TO RELY ON CERTIFICATION OF BUSINESS RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Comments: CASE LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS, OR ALTERNATIVELY, MOTION TO STAY AND COMPEL APPRAISAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss; Comments: OR ALTERNATIVELY MOTION TO STAY AND COMPEL APPRAISAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EM ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Imran Malik; Amount: -185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim; Comments: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInterrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less