This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 02/24/2021 at 16:31:58 (UTC).

AT HOME AUTO GLASS LLCvs.PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 AT HOME AUTO GLASS LLCvs PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Tina L Caraballo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************25-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Tina L Caraballo

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AT HOME AUTO GLASS LLC AAO HERALDO CARRENO

AT HOME AUTO GLASS LLC

HERALDO CARRENO AAO

Defendants

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

IMRAN MALIK

Defendant Attorney

ELISA MORALES

 

Court Documents

Objection

Objection; Comments: TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

Motion

Motion; Comments: FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND RENEWED MOTION TO STAY ANY AND ALL DISCOVERY, INCLUDING DEPOSITIONS - BY DEFT

Motion to Dismiss

Motion to Dismiss; Comments: OR ALTERNATIVELY, DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO ABATE OR STAY AND MOTION TO COMPEL APPRAISAL

Order Granting Substitution of Party

Order Granting Substitution of Party

Joint Stipulation

Joint Stipulation; Comments: TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Motion to Dismiss

Motion to Dismiss; Comments: AND STAY DISCOVERY by Defendants, PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EM ATTY

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim; Comments: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Interrogatories

Interrogatories

Addendum to

Addendum to

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketObjection; Comments: TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion; Comments: FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND RENEWED MOTION TO STAY ANY AND ALL DISCOVERY, INCLUDING DEPOSITIONS - BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss; Comments: OR ALTERNATIVELY, DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO ABATE OR STAY AND MOTION TO COMPEL APPRAISAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Granting Substitution of Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJoint Stipulation; Comments: TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss; Comments: AND STAY DISCOVERY by Defendants, PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EM ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Imran Malik; Amount: -185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim; Comments: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInterrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AT HOME AUTO GLASS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Progressive American Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Malik, Imran E