This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 11/22/2020 at 16:02:30 (UTC).

AT HOME AUTO GLASS LLCvs.PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 AT HOME AUTO GLASS LLCvs PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Gisela T Laurent. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************33-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Gisela T Laurent

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AT HOME AUTO GLASS LLC AAO DELILAH BAKER

AT HOME AUTO GLASS LLC

DELILAH BAKER AAO

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

IMRAN MALIK

Defendant Attorney

ELISA MORALES

 

Court Documents

Notice of Settlement

Notice of Settlement

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516 AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EM ATTY

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim; Comments: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Interrogatories

Interrogatories

Addendum to

Addendum to

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516 AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EM ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Imran Malik; Amount: -185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim; Comments: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInterrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less