This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 02/09/2021 at 22:45:51 (UTC).

ASHLIN PARK HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC vs. ASHTON ORLANDO RESIDENTIAL LLC et al.

Case Summary

On 01/29/2020 ASHLIN PARK HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against ASHTON ORLANDO RESIDENTIAL LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is John E Jordan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************71-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

John E Jordan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ASHLIN PARK HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

Defendants and 3Rd Party Plaintiffs

ASHTON ORLANDO RESIDENTIAL LLC

RANEY CONSTRUCTION INC

ZWRAP OF FLORIDA LLC

ADVANTAGE ALUMINUM INC

LA MAES SERVICES INC

AMERICAN BUILDERS SUPPLY INC

BEST SIDING AND CONSTRUCTION INC

SEVAN PLASTERING INC

PRIME PRO SERVICES INC

ASHTON WOODS HOMES DBA

Defendants and 3Rd Party Defendants

RANEY CONSTRUCTION INC

ADVANTAGE ALUMINUM INC

LA MAES SERVICES INC

ALVAREZ FAMILY PAINTING INC

AMERICAN BUILDERS SUPPLY INC

HUGH MCDONALD CONSTRUCTION INC

Z-WRAP OF FLORIDA LLC

SEVAN PLASTERING INC

BEST SIDING & CONSTRUCTION INC

DWF INSTALLATIONS

ACR FAMILY CONSTRUCTION INC NKA

PRIME PRO SERVICES INC

4Th Party Defendants

GRC WINDOW AND DOOR INC

DWF INSTALLATIONS, INC

4Th Party Plaintiff

AMERICAN BUILDERS SUPPLY, INC.

9 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DANIEL WEBERT

Defendant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff Attorney

CHAD DUNIGAN

3Rd Party Defendant and 4Th Party Plaintiff Attorneys

BRYAN KRASINSKI

TIMOTHY MOORHEAD

CHESLEY MOODY

BETH-ANN SCHULMAN

ASHLEY MATTINGLY

MICHAEL MILNE

KIERAN O'CONNOR

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY.

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served; Comments: ASHTON ORLANDO RESIDENTIAL, L.L.C.

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: NOTICE OF DESIGNATED EMAIL ADDRESS

Order Rule to Show Cause

Order Rule to Show Cause 69544275

Order Granting Motion to Amend

Order Granting Motion to Amend 69569702; Comments: complaint

Motion to Amend

Motion to Amend 69625279; Comments: complaint by interlineation in response to court's show cause order regarding the amount in controversy and alternative motion to file first amended complaint

Affidavit in Support

Affidavit in Support 69625280; Comments: of unopposed motion to amend complaint by interlineation in response to court's show cause order regarding the amount in controversy and alternative motion to file first amended complaint

Request for Copies

Request for Copies

Request for Copies

Request for Copies

Request for Copies

Request for Copies

Request for Copies

Request for Copies

Amended Complaint

Amended Complaint; Comments: SECOND

Notice of Compliance

Notice of Compliance; Comments: WITH CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

Notice of Compliance

Notice of Compliance; Comments: WITH CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER SECTION 4.12

Notice of Compliance

Notice of Compliance; Comments: WITH CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

Notice of Compliance

Notice of Compliance; Comments: WITH CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

125 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

02/04/2021
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Copies

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/04/2021
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Copies

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/04/2021
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Copies

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/04/2021
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Copies

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2021

FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: WEBERT, DANIEL ROBERT; Amount: -32.50

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2021

FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 32.50

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2021
View Court Documents

DocketAmended Complaint; Comments: SECOND

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/29/2021
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Compliance; Comments: WITH CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/28/2021
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Compliance; Comments: WITH CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER SECTION 4.12

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/28/2021
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Compliance; Comments: WITH CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
135 More Docket Entries
03/16/2020
View Court Documents

DocketThird Party Complaint; Comments: **FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT ATTACHED AS EXHIBIT 1**

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/25/2020
View Court Documents

DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: to plaintiff's complaint.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/17/2020
View Court Documents

DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: NOTICE OF DESIGNATED EMAIL ADDRESS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/05/2020
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Returned Served; Comments: ASHTON ORLANDO RESIDENTIAL, L.L.C.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2020
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/29/2020

FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Barker Martin; Amount: -410.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/29/2020

FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 410.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/29/2020
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/29/2020
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/29/2020

DocketCase Initiated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less