This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 03/13/2023 at 15:37:12 (UTC).

APEX ROOFING & RESTORATION LLC vs. TRUCK INSURANCE EXCHANGE

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 APEX ROOFING RESTORATION LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TRUCK INSURANCE EXCHANGE. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Vincent Falcone. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************67-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Vincent Falcone

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

APEX ROOFING & RESTORATION LLC

CLAUDETTE TURNER AAO

DEANDRA TURNER AAO

Defendant

TRUCK INSURANCE EXCHANGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARGARET GARNER

Defendant Attorney

GREGORY TERRONE

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: Served-Truck Insurance Exchange

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Motion to Dismiss

Motion to Dismiss

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY

Order Enlargement and Extension of Time

Order Enlargement and Extension of Time

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Enlargement and Extension of Time

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: Served-Truck Insurance Exchange

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Katranis Wald Garner PLLC; Amount: -410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Taking Deposition(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less