This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 03/04/2023 at 13:39:22 (UTC).

AMERICAN GENERAL HOME EQUITY - VS - CITY OF APOPKA

Case Summary

On 07/19/2022 AMERICAN GENERAL HOME EQUITY - filed an Other lawsuit against - CITY OF APOPKA. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The case status is Pending - Appeal.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************-A-O

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Appeal

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

 

Party Details

Appellant

AMERICAN GENERAL HOME EQUITY

Appellee

CITY OF APOPKA

 

Court Documents

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing

CVA Notice of Appeal Filed

CVA Notice of Appeal Filed

Acknowledgment of Appeal

Acknowledgment of Appeal

Invoice

Invoice; Comments: $20.00 (EMAILED ATTY)

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO DESIGNATE RECORDINGS OF PROCEEDINGS FOR TRANSCRIPTION

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO DESIGNATE RECORDINGS OF PROCEEDINGS FOR TRANSCRIPTION - AMENDED

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: APPELLANT'S SECOND MOTION TO DESIGNATE RECORDINGS OF PROCEEDINGS FOR TRANSCRIPTION

Request

Request; Comments: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND REQUEST FOR STAY

Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest; Comments: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND REQUEST FOR STAY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: APPELLANT'S SECOND MOTION TO DESIGNATE RECORDINGS OF PROCEEDINGS FOR TRANSCRIPTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO DESIGNATE RECORDINGS OF PROCEEDINGS FOR TRANSCRIPTION - AMENDED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO DESIGNATE RECORDINGS OF PROCEEDINGS FOR TRANSCRIPTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: quarles & brady; Amount: -20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: QUARLES & BRADY LLP; Amount: -260.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 280.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInvoice; Comments: $20.00 (EMAILED ATTY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Appeal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCVA Notice of Appeal Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less