This case was last updated from Not Yet Classified on 01/20/2022 at 16:41:42 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANKvs.M MITROPOULOS

Case Summary

On 12/27/2021 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANKvs M MITROPOULOS was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Not Yet Classified, Not Yet Classified located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Elizabeth J Starr and Andrew Bain. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************41-O

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Yet Classified

Judge Details

Judges

Elizabeth J Starr

Andrew Bain

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK FSB SBM

Defendants

M MITROPOULOS

Gotha, FL 34734

MARCUS MITROPOULOS AKA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCOTT MODLIN

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: emailed to attorney

Notification re: Civil Case Management

Notification re: Civil Case Management

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2022
  • HearingHearing: Pre-Trial Civil - Civil, Pretrial; Location: Video/Audio/Tele Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketHEARING - Pre-Trial Civil - Civil, Pretrial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotification re: Civil Case Management

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: emailed to attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: AMERICAN EXPRESS; Amount: -310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB, A FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Modlin, Scott Eric