This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 01/13/2023 at 02:21:48 (UTC).

AMAZING ROOFERS INC AAOvs.SOUTHERN FIDELITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/07/2022 AMAZING ROOFERS INC AAOvs SOUTHERN FIDELITY INSURANCE COMPANY was filed as a Contract - Insurance lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************04-O

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AMAZING ROOFERS INC AAO

DANIEL BELALCAZAR AAO

Defendant

SOUTHERN FIDELITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL GERMAIN

Defendant Attorney

FRANK MADIA

 

Court Documents

Reply

Reply

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Order Enlargement and Extension of Time

Order Enlargement and Extension of Time

Order Enlargement and Extension of Time

Order Enlargement and Extension of Time

Letter

Letter

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Complaint

Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Enlargement and Extension of Time

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Enlargement and Extension of Time

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Michael B Germain; Amount: -410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMAZING ROOFERS INC AAO is a litigant

Latest cases where Southern Fidelity Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FRANK MADIA