Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 02/20/2019 at 15:32:46 (UTC).

AMALFI APARTMENTS LLC vs. JARYLEE TORO, ANAYS VELAZQUEZ

Case Summary

On 12/22/2018 AMALFI APARTMENTS LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JARYLEE TORO, ANAYS VELAZQUEZ. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Eric H DuBois. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************32-O

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Eric H DuBois

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMALFI APARTMENTS LLC

Defendants

JARYLEE TORO

ANAYS VELAZQUEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JAY SWISTAK

 

Court Documents

Returned Mail

Returned Mail

Returned Mail

Returned Mail

Writ of Possession Issued

Writ of Possession Issued

Final Judgment

Final Judgment

Default Entered by the Clerk

Default Entered by the Clerk; Comments: E Mail Attorney

Affidavit of Non Military Service

Affidavit of Non Military Service

Motion for Final Judgment

Motion for Final Judgment; Comments: for default by Amalfi Apartments LLC

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: posted Jary-Lee Toro

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: posted Anays Velazquez

Motion for Default

Motion for Default; Comments: nd proposed against Jary-Lee Toro, Anays Velazquez

Certificate of Mailing

Certificate of Mailing

Correspondence

Correspondence

Summons Issued 5 Day

Summons Issued 5 Day; Comments: Emailed to Atty

Amended Complaint

Amended Complaint; Comments: FOR TENANT EVICTION

Complaint

Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Returned Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Returned Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Possession Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Default Entered by the Clerk; Comments: E Mail Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit of Non Military Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Final Judgment; Comments: for default by Amalfi Apartments LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit of Service; Comments: posted Jary-Lee Toro

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit of Service; Comments: posted Anays Velazquez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Default; Comments: nd proposed against Jary-Lee Toro, Anays Velazquez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Correspondence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued 5 Day; Comments: Emailed to Atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Complaint; Comments: FOR TENANT EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2018
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2018
  • Description: Payment; Payer: SWISTAK, JAY LAWRENCE; Amount: -195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2018
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 195.00

    Read MoreRead Less