This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 01/13/2019 at 15:33:02 (UTC).

ALSCO INC vs. LIFESTREAM BEHAVIORAL CENTER INC

Case Summary

On 11/14/2018 ALSCO INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LIFESTREAM BEHAVIORAL CENTER INC. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Jose R Rodriguez and Luis F Calderon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************50-O

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Circuit Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Jose R Rodriguez

Luis F Calderon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALSCO INC

Defendant

LIFESTREAM BEHAVIORAL CENTER INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEPHEN GEBELOFF

Defendant Attorney

BRIAN WAGNER

 

Court Documents

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO ANSWER/RESPOND TO DEFENDANT S COUNTERCLAIM by ALSCO, INC

Answer Affirmative Defenses & Counter Claim/Counter Petition

Answer Affirmative Defenses & Counter Claim/Counter Petition; Comments: Lifestream Behavioral Center, Inc.

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: LIFESTREAM BEHAVIORAL CENTER, INC.

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: Lifestream Behavioral Center

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Complaint

Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO ANSWER/RESPOND TO DEFENDANT S COUNTERCLAIM by ALSCO, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer Affirmative Defenses & Counter Claim/Counter Petition; Comments: Lifestream Behavioral Center, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: LIFESTREAM BEHAVIORAL CENTER, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit of Service; Comments: Lifestream Behavioral Center

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued Electronically as to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • Description: Payment; Payer: Thomas R. Harbert; Amount: -395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • Description: Payment; Payer: Stephen B. Gebeloff; Amount: -410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LIFESTREAM BEHAVIORAL CENTER, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ALSCO INC A NEVADA CORPORATION KNOWN IN CALIFORNIA AS STEINER CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRIAN WAGNER