Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 02/13/2021 at 22:41:43 (UTC).

ALLIED HEALTHCARE OF CENTRAL FLORIDA INC vs.DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/26/2020 ALLIED HEALTHCARE OF CENTRAL FLORIDA INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Evellen H Jewett and Amy J Carter. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************22-O

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Evellen H Jewett

Amy J Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ALLIED HEALTHCARE OF CENTRAL FLORIDA INC

FRANTZDY FEVRIER AAO

Defendant

DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PAMELA RAKOW-SMITH

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: emailed atty

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: emailed atty

Notice to Appear Returned Unserved

Notice to Appear Returned Unserved; Comments: UNUSED

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: emailed atty

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2020
  • HearingHearing: CANCELED-Cancelled Pre-Trial Civil; Location: Room 130.02 on the 1st Floor Pre-Trial Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketHEARING - CANCELED-Cancelled Pre-Trial Civil

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • HearingHearing: CANCELED-Cancelled Pre-Trial Civil; Location: Room 130.02 on the 1st Floor Pre-Trial Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketHEARING - CANCELED-Cancelled Pre-Trial Civil

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • HearingHearing: CANCELED-Cancelled Pre-Trial Civil; Location: Room 130.02 on the 1st Floor Pre-Trial Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketHEARING - CANCELED-Cancelled Pre-Trial Civil

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Comments: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear Returned Unserved; Comments: UNUSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketService Document Unable to be Issued; Comments: no return of service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: RAKOW-SMITH, PAMELA J.; Amount: -10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: emailed atty **NEEDS TO BE AMENDED**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Eiffert and Associates PA; Amount: -310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALLIED HEALTHCARE OF CENTRAL FLORIDA, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Direct General Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RAKOW-SMITH PAMELA J