Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 03/03/2021 at 18:13:09 (UTC).

ALLIED HEALTHCARE OF CENTRAL FLORIDA INC vs. PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/28/2020 ALLIED HEALTHCARE OF CENTRAL FLORIDA INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Elizabeth J Starr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************26-O

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Elizabeth J Starr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ALLIED HEALTHCARE OF CENTRAL FLORIDA INC

LAMAR THOMAS AAO

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PAMELA RAKOW-SMITH

Defendant Attorney

DANIEL CROTTA

 

Court Documents

Motion

Motion; Comments: (Pltfs) for Ruling on Defts Objections toi Pltfs Request to Produce

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Petition or Motion to Strike

Petition or Motion to Strike; Comments: AND/OR MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT AS TO DEFENDANT S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE by ALLIED HEALTHCARE OF CENTRAL FLORIDA, INC

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: (AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE)

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL- BY DEFT

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: NOTICE OF E-MAIL DESIGNATION

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

Addendum to

Addendum to; Comments: CIVIL COVER SHEET

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion; Comments: (Pltfs) for Ruling on Defts Objections toi Pltfs Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition or Motion to Strike; Comments: AND/OR MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT AS TO DEFENDANT S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE by ALLIED HEALTHCARE OF CENTRAL FLORIDA, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: (AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply to Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL- BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: NOTICE OF E-MAIL DESIGNATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Comments: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Eiffert and Associates PA; Amount: -65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to; Comments: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALLIED HEALTHCARE OF CENTRAL FLORIDA, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Progressive American Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CROTTA DANIEL R