Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 02/28/2021 at 12:27:40 (UTC).

ALLIED HEALTHCARE OF CENTRAL FLORIDA INC vs. OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/18/2020 ALLIED HEALTHCARE OF CENTRAL FLORIDA INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Evellen H Jewett and Amy J Carter. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************22-O

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Evellen H Jewett

Amy J Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ALLIED HEALTHCARE OF CENTRAL FLORIDA INC

MARIE DUROSEAU AAO

Defendant

OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JASON GILLER

Defendant Attorney

BENJAMIN SILVANIC

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY.

Correspondence

Correspondence

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Motion to Invoke Florida Rules of Civil Procedure

Motion to Invoke Florida Rules of Civil Procedure

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Addendum to

Addendum to; Comments: CIVIL COVER SHEET COUNTY COURT ADDENDUM

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Jason Giller; Amount: -90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrespondence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Invoke Florida Rules of Civil Procedure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to; Comments: CIVIL COVER SHEET COUNTY COURT ADDENDUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALLIED HEALTHCARE OF CENTRAL FLORIDA, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Silvanic, Benjamin W