Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 02/28/2021 at 12:27:57 (UTC).

ALLIED HEALTHCARE OF CENTRAL FLORIDA INC vs. INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/18/2020 ALLIED HEALTHCARE OF CENTRAL FLORIDA INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Evellen H Jewett and Amy J Carter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************24-O

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Evellen H Jewett

Amy J Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ALLIED HEALTHCARE OF CENTRAL FLORIDA INC

JEAN ALCIME AAO

Defendant

INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JASON GILLER

Defendant Attorney

COLIN HERSHEY

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

Order Enlargement and Extension of Time

Order Enlargement and Extension of Time; Comments: GRANTED 30 days to respond to plaintiffs request for production and interrogatories

Reply

Reply; Comments: PLAINTIFF S REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF S DISCOVERY TO DEFENDANT

Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel; Comments: PLAINTIFF S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT S RESPONSE TO FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel; Comments: PLAINTIFF S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT S RESPONSE TO FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF S COMPLAINT by INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY,

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY,

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

Correspondence

Correspondence

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Motion to Invoke Florida Rules of Civil Procedure

Motion to Invoke Florida Rules of Civil Procedure

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Addendum to

Addendum to; Comments: CIVIL COVER SHEET COUNTY COURT ADDENDUM.

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Enlargement and Extension of Time; Comments: AGREED - GRANTED 30 days to respond to complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Enlargement and Extension of Time; Comments: GRANTED 30 days to respond to plaintiffs request for production and interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketOrder Granting; Comments: AGREED - defendant shall provide its responses to complaint within 30 days from the date of this order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketOrder Granting; Comments: AGREED - defendant shall provide its responses to plaintiffs request for production and interrogatories within 30 days from the date of this order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply; Comments: PLAINTIFF S REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF S DISCOVERY TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel; Comments: PLAINTIFF S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT S RESPONSE TO FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel; Comments: PLAINTIFF S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT S RESPONSE TO FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrespondence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Invoke Florida Rules of Civil Procedure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to; Comments: CIVIL COVER SHEET COUNTY COURT ADDENDUM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALLIED HEALTHCARE OF CENTRAL FLORIDA, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Infinity Auto Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HERSHEY , COLIN MICHAEL