Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 03/20/2021 at 17:11:51 (UTC).

ALLIANCE CHIROPRACTIC GROUP INC vs. GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/24/2021 ALLIANCE CHIROPRACTIC GROUP INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian F Duckworth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************38-O

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Brian F Duckworth

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ALLIANCE CHIROPRACTIC GROUP INC

JOHNSON CLERVIL AAO

Defendant

GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVE SOOKLAL

Defendant Attorney

MEGAN LINDSEY

 

Court Documents

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: DISCLOSURE, AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF S COMPLAINT AND DISCOVERY by GEICO

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: GEICO Indemnity Company

Complaint

Complaint

Summons Issued

Summons Issued; Comments: emailed to plaintiff's attorney

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Addendum to

Addendum to

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: DISCLOSURE, AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF S COMPLAINT AND DISCOVERY by GEICO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: GEICO Indemnity Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued; Comments: emailed to plaintiff's attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Anthony-Smith Law, PA; Amount: -310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALLIANCE CHIROPRACTIC GROUP INC is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MEGAN LINDSEY