This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 07/09/2022 at 15:32:48 (UTC).

ALLEN, KAYDENCE vs. GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/10/2022 ALLEN, KAYDENCE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Vincent S. Chiu. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************91-O

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Vincent S. Chiu

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KAYDENCE ALLEN

Defendant

GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BRYAN MATTHEWS

CHRISTINA ARGUELLES

Defendant Attorney

IAN WALTERS

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: Government Employees Insurance Company

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice

Notice; Comments: OF DISCLOSURE

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

Notice of Unavailability

Notice of Unavailability

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice of Production of Non-Party

Notice of Production of Non-Party

Request for Copies

Request for Copies

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Copies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Production of Non-Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Unavailability

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; Comments: OF DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: Government Employees Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: The Nation Law Firm; Amount: -410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Government Employees Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Walters, Ian Chadwick