Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 04/07/2021 at 22:32:40 (UTC).

ALL INJURY AND DIAGNOSTIC CLINIC vs. GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/28/2021 ALL INJURY AND DIAGNOSTIC CLINIC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Carly S Wish. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************33-O

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Carly S Wish

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALL INJURY AND DIAGNOSTIC CLINIC

Defendant

GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBERT HORST

 

Court Documents

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF S COMPLAINT by GEICO

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: DISCLOSURE, AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim; Comments: GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Addendum to

Addendum to

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF S COMPLAINT by GEICO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: DISCLOSURE, AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Maria Paez; Amount: -65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim; Comments: GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALL INJURY AND DIAGNOSTIC CLINIC is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HORST, ROBERT J.