Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 04/11/2021 at 16:43:18 (UTC).

ALL INJURY AND DIAGNOSTIC CLINIC vs. FIRST ACCEPTANCE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/09/2021 ALL INJURY AND DIAGNOSTIC CLINIC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against FIRST ACCEPTANCE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Elizabeth J Starr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************84-O

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Elizabeth J Starr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ALL INJURY AND DIAGNOSTIC CLINIC

CARMEN REDDICK AKA

CARMEN REDDICK AAO

Defendant

FIRST ACCEPTANCE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBERT HORST

Defendant Attorney

WILLIAM MCFARLANE

 

Court Documents

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY.

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Addendum to

Addendum to; Comments: CIVIL COVER SHEET COUNTY COURT ADDENDUM.

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Taking Deposition(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Maria Paez; Amount: -310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to; Comments: CIVIL COVER SHEET COUNTY COURT ADDENDUM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALL INJURY AND DIAGNOSTIC CLINIC is a litigant

Latest cases where First Acceptance Insurance Company Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCFARLANE, WILLIAM