Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 02/10/2021 at 23:51:15 (UTC).

ALL INJURY AND DIAGNOSTIC CLINIC LLCvs.GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 ALL INJURY AND DIAGNOSTIC CLINIC LLCvs GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY was filed as a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Gisela T Laurent and Carly S Wish. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************63-O

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Gisela T Laurent

Carly S Wish

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ALL INJURY AND DIAGNOSTIC CLINIC LLC

TREZURE NEAL AAO

Defendant

GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBERT HORST

Defendant Attorney

MEGAN LINDSEY

 

Court Documents

Notice of Cancellation of Deposition

Notice of Cancellation of Deposition 69699696; Comments: July 8, 2020 at 11:00 AM

Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal 69699697

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: DISCLOSURE, AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: EMAILED TO THE ATTORNEY

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Cancellation of Deposition; Comments: July 8, 2020 at 11:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • HearingHearing: Pre-Trial Civil; Location: Room 130.02 on the 1st Floor Pre-Trial Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketHEARING - Pre-Trial Civil

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Taking Deposition(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: DISCLOSURE, AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: EMAILED TO THE ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketService Document Unable to be Issued; Comments: NO ISSUE. INCORRECT FORMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Maria Paez; Amount: -310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALL INJURY AND DIAGNOSTIC CLINIC is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MEGAN LINDSEY