This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 08/07/2022 at 15:41:11 (UTC).

ALI, YASMIN vs. JENKINS, JAMILA CHAVAEet al.

Case Summary

On 06/08/2022 ALI, YASMIN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JENKINS, JAMILA CHAVAE. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey L Ashton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************05-O

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Jeffrey L Ashton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YASMIN ALI

Defendants

JAMILA CHAVAE JENKINS

JUDITH ANN FOSTER

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DONNA ZMIJEWSKI

Defendant Attorney

JENNIFER BROOKS

 

Court Documents

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: SERVED 6/17/2022 JUDITH ANN FOSTER

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: SERVED AS TO PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Complaint

Complaint

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service; Comments: SERVED 6/17/2022 JUDITH ANN FOSTER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service; Comments: SERVED AS TO PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Dan Newlin Injury Attorneys; Amount: -430.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 430.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Progressive American Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BROOKS , JENNIFER