This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 03/08/2023 at 12:08:53 (UTC).

ALABRE, MAX vs. UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/23/2022 ALABRE, MAX filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Denise Kim Beamer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************43-O

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Denise Kim Beamer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MAX ALABRE

Defendant

UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SUNNI DEGRACIA

Defendant Attorney

MICHAEL MCDONALD

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Complaint

Complaint

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: em atty

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice of Unavailability

Notice of Unavailability

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Unavailability

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: em atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: David Low, Esq.; Amount: -410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less