This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 11/13/2022 at 15:58:01 (UTC).

AJAY K. GOYAL, M.D. INC vs. MGA INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.

Case Summary

On 09/14/2022 AJAY K GOYAL, M D INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MGA INSURANCE COMPANY, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrew Bain. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************80-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Andrew Bain

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AJAY K. GOYAL, M.D. INC

DANIEL OLGUIN AAO

Defendant

MGA INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JESSICA PICKERAL

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Addendum to

Addendum to; Comments: CIVIL COVER SHEET

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: em atty

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: em atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Jessica Pickeral; Amount: -185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to; Comments: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AJAY K. GOYAL, M.D., INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where MGA Insurance Company Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JESSICA PICKERAL