This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 03/14/2022 at 15:54:21 (UTC).

AIR QUALITY EXPERTS CORPORATIONvs.FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/13/2022 AIR QUALITY EXPERTS CORPORATIONvs FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrew L Cameron. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************56-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Andrew L Cameron

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AIR QUALITY EXPERTS CORPORATION

ALISAN ONSOY AAO

BERNA COOPER AAO

Defendant

FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CAMILO PULIDO

OREN REICH

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: em atty

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served

Notice of Settlement

Notice of Settlement

Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: em atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketService Document Unable to be Issued; Comments: Per Administrative Order NO. 2009-12-02 Civil Cover Sheet Addendum needs to be Submitted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketService Document Unable to be Issued; Comments: Per Administrative Order NO. 2009-12-02 First Party Insurance Claims effective immediately any Glass or Personal Injury Protection Cases will need to attach a Civil Cover Sheet Addendum along with a Proposed 20 Day Summons for issuance instead of a Proposed Notice to Appear.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketService Document Unable to be Issued; Comments: Per Administrative Order NO. 2009-12-02 First Party Insurance Claims effective immediately any Glass or Personal Injury Protection Cases, other Civil (other claim for first party insurance benefits) will need to attach a Civil Cover Sheet Addendum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketService Document Unable to be Issued; Comments: Per Admin Order No. 2021-04, a Standing Case Management Plan/Order for Streamlined or General civil cases must be submitted before summonses can be issued. Please resubmit the proposed summons along with the Case management Order Separately.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: PULIDO, CAMILO E.; Amount: -185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AIR QUALITY EXPERTS CORPORATION A/A/O BRIAN & TRICIA GERARD is a litigant

Latest cases where Federal Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CAMILO PULIDO

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REICH, OREN