This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 04/23/2023 at 15:48:46 (UTC).

AFO IMAGING INC vs.USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/22/2023 AFO IMAGING INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is David P Johnson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************09-O

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

David P Johnson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AFO IMAGING INC

ADVANCED DIAGNOSTIC GROUP DBA

Defendant

USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREGORY GUDIN

Defendant Attorney

KATY MELCHIORRE

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Addendum to

Addendum to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed Atty

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed Atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Landau Associates, P.A.; Amount: -310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less