This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 03/21/2022 at 16:11:38 (UTC).

AFO IMAGING INC vs. OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/20/2022 AFO IMAGING INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrew L Cameron. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************32-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Andrew L Cameron

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AFO IMAGING INC

CARLISSA BRUMBACK AAO

ADVANCED DIAGNOSTIC GROUP DBA

Defendant

OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EDUARDO RODRIGUEZ

Defendant Attorney

RUSSELL KOLODZIEJ

 

Court Documents

Request to Produce

Request to Produce; Comments: Supplemental

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions; Comments: Supplemental

Notice of Service

Notice of Service; Comments: OF SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORIES REGARDING RELATEDNESS AND MEDICAL NECESSITY

Motion

Motion; Comments: FOR LEAVE TO SERVE ADDITIONAL INTERROGATORIES REQUESTS

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Motion for Final Judgment

Motion for Final Judgment; Comments: AND MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING ENTITLEMENT TO ATTORNEY S FEES

Memorandum

Memorandum

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO FILE A RESPONSIVE PLEADING

Demand for Jury Trial

Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim; Comments: OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Addendum to

Addendum to

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce; Comments: Supplemental

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions; Comments: Supplemental

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service; Comments: OF SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORIES REGARDING RELATEDNESS AND MEDICAL NECESSITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion; Comments: FOR LEAVE TO SERVE ADDITIONAL INTERROGATORIES REQUESTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Final Judgment; Comments: AND MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING ENTITLEMENT TO ATTORNEY S FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO FILE A RESPONSIVE PLEADING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim; Comments: OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Advanced Diagnostic Group is a litigant

Latest cases where AFO Imaging Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kolodziej, Russell S