This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 01/23/2022 at 16:12:47 (UTC).

AFO IMAGING INC vs. GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 AFO IMAGING INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Elizabeth J Starr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************17-O

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Elizabeth J Starr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AFO IMAGING INC

LEXANDREA ROMAIN AAO

ADVANCED DIAGNOSTIC GROUP DBA

Defendant

GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREGORY GUDIN

Defendant Attorney

DEBBIE BROWN

 

Court Documents

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Motion to Stay

Motion to Stay; Comments: PROCEEDINGS AND SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM FILED BY DEFT. GEICO

Motion for Protective Order

Motion for Protective Order; Comments: AND SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF LAW FILED BY DEFT. GEICO

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Addendum to

Addendum to

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Stay; Comments: PROCEEDINGS AND SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM FILED BY DEFT. GEICO

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Landau Associates, P.A.; Amount: -65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Advanced Diagnostic Group is a litigant

Latest cases where AFO Imaging Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant