This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 01/23/2022 at 16:12:58 (UTC).

AFO IMAGING INC vs. GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 AFO IMAGING INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Elizabeth J Starr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************18-O

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Elizabeth J Starr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AFO IMAGING INC

LORENZO RIVERA AAO

ADVANCED DIAGNOSTIC GROUP DBA

Defendant

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREGORY GUDIN

Defendant Attorney

DEBBIE BROWN

 

Court Documents

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Reply to Affirmative Defenses; Comments: AND ANSWER AND MOTION TO STRIKE FILED BY PLTF.

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Motion

Motion; Comments: FOR LEAVE TO SERVE ADDITIONAL INTERROGATORIES FILED BY PLTF.

Supplemental Interrogatories

Supplemental Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce; Comments: SUPPLEMENTAL

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Protective Order

Motion for Protective Order; Comments: AND SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF LAW

Motion to Stay

Motion to Stay; Comments: AND SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM TO STAY PROCEEDINGS

Answer

Answer

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Addendum to

Addendum to

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply to Affirmative Defenses; Comments: AND ANSWER AND MOTION TO STRIKE FILED BY PLTF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion; Comments: FOR LEAVE TO SERVE ADDITIONAL INTERROGATORIES FILED BY PLTF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSupplemental Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce; Comments: SUPPLEMENTAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Protective Order; Comments: AND SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF LAW

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Landau Associates, P.A.; Amount: -65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Advanced Diagnostic Group is a litigant

Latest cases where AFO Imaging Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant