This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 01/22/2022 at 16:14:00 (UTC).

AFO IMAGING INC vs. GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/23/2021 AFO IMAGING INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Brian F Duckworth and Andrew L Cameron. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************21-O

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Brian F Duckworth

Andrew L Cameron

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AFO IMAGING INC

MANUEL REYES AAO

ADVANCED DIAGNOSTIC GROUP DBA

Defendant

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREGORY GUDIN

Defendant Attorney

JENNELL LOPER

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Addendum to

Addendum to

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued

Summons Issued; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTORNEY

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: Served-GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: DEFT TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Motion

Motion; Comments: AND SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM TO STAY PROCEEDINGS

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion; Comments: AND SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM TO STAY PROCEEDINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: DEFT TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: Served-GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Landau Associates, P.A.; Amount: -90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Advanced Diagnostic Group is a litigant

Latest cases where AFO Imaging Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JENNELL LOPER