This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 08/07/2022 at 16:34:11 (UTC).

AFO IMAGING INC vs. SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/07/2022 AFO IMAGING INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian Sandor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************56-O

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Brian Sandor

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AFO IMAGING INC DBA ADVANCED DIAGNOSTIC GROUP

AFO IMAGING INC

LUIS GALVIS AAO

ADVANCED DIAGNOSTIC GROUP DBA

Defendant

SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GREGORY GUDIN

ANA MULET

Defendant Attorney

TAISHA EASTERLING

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Addendum to

Addendum to; Comments: Administrative Order 2009-12-02 -

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed Attorney Issued Summon

Notice of Service

Notice of Service; Comments: ELECTRONIC DELIVERY on Thursday, June 16, 2022 SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service; Comments: ELECTRONIC DELIVERY on Thursday, June 16, 2022 SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed Attorney Issued Summon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Landau Associates, P.A.; Amount: -65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to; Comments: Administrative Order 2009-12-02 -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Advanced Diagnostic Group is a litigant

Latest cases where AFO Imaging Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Security National Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EASTERLING , TAISHA