Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 02/11/2021 at 10:58:15 (UTC).

ADVENTIST HEALTH SYSTEM SUNBELT INCvs.STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/18/2020 ADVENTIST HEALTH SYSTEM SUNBELT INCvs STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY was filed as a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Elizabeth J Starr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************04-O

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Elizabeth J Starr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DEBBIE ROOP AAO

ADVENTHEALTH APOPKA DBA

ADVENTIST HEALTH SYSTEM SUNBELT INC

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BENJAMIN LOVING

Defendant Attorneys

LAUREN OWENS

AMY BLAKE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Order on Motion for Substitution of Counsel

Order on Motion for Substitution of Counsel

Joint Motion for Substitution of Counsel

Joint Motion for Substitution of Counsel

Notice

Notice; Comments: that Policy Limits Have Been Reached (Benefits are Exhausted)

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: and Demand for Jury Trial - State Farm Mutal Automobile Insurance Company

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: to Respond to Complaint - State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: emailed to attorney

Letter

Letter; Comments: BRADFORD CEDERBERG

Complaint

Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Unavailability

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions; Comments: SECOND REQUEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPrivilege Log

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Motion for Substitution of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: emailed to attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: BradfordCederberg, PA; Amount: -310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter; Comments: BRADFORD CEDERBERG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ADVENTIST HEALTH SYSTEM SUNBELT INC is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOVING, BENJAMIN