Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 02/11/2021 at 18:13:01 (UTC).

ADVENTIST HEALTH SYSTEM SUNBELT INCvs.ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/24/2020 ADVENTIST HEALTH SYSTEM SUNBELT INCvs ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY was filed as a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Gisela T Laurent and Carly S Wish. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************81-O

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Gisela T Laurent

Carly S Wish

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RICK JO MULLINS AAO

ADVENTHEALTH APOPKA DBA

ADVENTIST HEALTH SYSTEM SUNBELT INC

Defendant

ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AMANDA REHER

Defendant Attorney

ANTHONY PARRINO

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

Notice of Settlement

Notice of Settlement

Not of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med

Not of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med; Comments: AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: proof of service of process and original summons for Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. Attached.

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: emailed to attorney

Letter

Letter; Comments: BRADFORD CEDERBERG

Complaint

Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • HearingHearing: CANCELED-Cancelled Pre-Trial Civil; Location: Room 130.02 on the 1st Floor Pre-Trial Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketHEARING - CANCELED-Cancelled Pre-Trial Civil

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNot of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med; Comments: AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Comments: proof of service of process and original summons for Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. Attached.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: emailed to attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: BradfordCederberg, PA; Amount: -310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter; Comments: BRADFORD CEDERBERG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ADVENTIST HEALTH SYSTEM SUNBELT INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANTHONY J PARRINO