Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 03/22/2021 at 17:00:15 (UTC).

ADVENTIST HEALTH SYSTEM SUNBELT INC vs. UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

Case Summary

On 02/26/2021 ADVENTIST HEALTH SYSTEM SUNBELT INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Tina L Caraballo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************78-O

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Tina L Caraballo

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ADVENTIST HEALTH SYSTEM SUNBELT INC

ADVENTHEALTH WINTER PARK DBA

HEIDI URBAN AAO

Defendant

UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AMANDA REHER

Defendant Attorney

NICHOLAS FERREIRO

 

Court Documents

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND 2.516 DESIGNATION

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Complaint

Complaint

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet; Comments: ADDENDUM

Letter

Letter

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND 2.516 DESIGNATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: REHER, AMANDA HUNTER; Amount: -310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Comments: ADDENDUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ADVENTIST HEALTH SYSTEM SUNBELT INC is a litigant

Latest cases where United Services Automobile Association is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ferreiro, Nicholas A.