This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 04/29/2019 at 15:51:37 (UTC).

ADVANCED PHYSICAL THERAPY OF CENTRAL FLORIDA INC vs. GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/28/2019 ADVANCED PHYSICAL THERAPY OF CENTRAL FLORIDA INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Faye L Allen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************06-O

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Faye L Allen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ACCIDENT & INJURY QUICK CARE AKA

ADVANCED PHYSICAL THERAPY OF CENTRAL FLORIDA INC

Defendant

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GINA KIMMEL

Defendant Attorney

MIKHAL WRIGHT

 

Court Documents

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: DISCLOSURE AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, PIONNE CORBIN

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Complaint

Complaint

Summary of Proceedings

Summary of Proceedings

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: emailed

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

04/15/2019
View Court Documents

Summary of Proceedings

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/05/2019

HEARING - Pre-Trial Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/26/2019
View Court Documents

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: DISCLOSURE AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/13/2019
View Court Documents

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, PIONNE CORBIN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/06/2019
View Court Documents

Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: emailed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2019
View Court Documents

Notice of Designation of Email Address

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2019
View Court Documents

Request to Produce

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2019
View Court Documents

Request for Admissions

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2019
View Court Documents

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2019
View Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2019
View Court Documents

Complaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2019

Case Initiated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2019

Description: Payment; Payer: Gina Kimmel; Amount: -310.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2019

Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less