Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 03/07/2019 at 15:35:01 (UTC).

ADVANCED 3-D DIAGNOSTICS, INC. vs. PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/05/2019 ADVANCED 3-D DIAGNOSTICS, INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Eric H DuBois. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************88-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Eric H DuBois

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ADVANCED 3-D DIAGNOSTICS, INC.

GUICHNEIDINE LOUISMA AAO

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JASON GILLER

Defendant Attorney

REBECCA BENCH

 

Court Documents

Notice of Settlement

Notice of Settlement

Summary of Proceedings

Summary of Proceedings

Not of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med

Not of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med; Comments: AND NOTICE OF E-MAIL DESIGNATION scheduled for February 15, 2019, be cancelled.

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: Emailed to Atty

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Correspondence

Correspondence

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Motion to Invoke Florida Rules of Civil Procedure

Motion to Invoke Florida Rules of Civil Procedure

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summary of Proceedings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • HEARING - Pre-Trial Civil

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Not of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med; Comments: AND NOTICE OF E-MAIL DESIGNATION scheduled for February 15, 2019, be cancelled.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: Emailed to Atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Correspondence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Invoke Florida Rules of Civil Procedure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2019
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2019
  • Description: Payment; Payer: Jason Giller; Amount: -90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2019
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ADVANCED 3-D DIAGNOSTICS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Progressive American Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JASON GILLER