This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 03/15/2019 at 15:50:06 (UTC).

ADVANCED 3-D DIAGNOSTICS, INC. vs. CENTURY-NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/14/2019 ADVANCED 3-D DIAGNOSTICS, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CENTURY-NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Elizabeth J Starr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************71-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Elizabeth J Starr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ADVANCED 3-D DIAGNOSTICS, INC.

Defendant

CENTURY-NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JASON GILLER

Defendant Attorney

WILLIAM MCFARLANE

 

Court Documents

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF S COMPLAINT

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF S DISCOVERY

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Not of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med

Not of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: CENTURY-NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY, LYNETTE COLEMAN

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Correspondence

Correspondence

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Motion to Invoke Florida Rules of Civil Procedure

Motion to Invoke Florida Rules of Civil Procedure; Comments: Advanced 3-D Diagnostics, Inc.,

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF S DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • HEARING - CANCELED-Cancelled Pre-Trial Civil

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Not of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: CENTURY-NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY, LYNETTE COLEMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice to Appear Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Correspondence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Invoke Florida Rules of Civil Procedure; Comments: Advanced 3-D Diagnostics, Inc.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Description: Payment; Payer: Jason Giller; Amount: -65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 65.00

    Read MoreRead Less